This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/21/2020 at 02:20:11 (UTC).

Ramon Rios vs Gonzalo Maldonado et al.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Ramon Rios filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gonzalo Maldonado. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2241

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rios, Ramon

Defendants

Maldonado, Gonzalo

Cheema Freightlines, LLC

Hausmann, Michael John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Millard, Mark E.

Defendant Attorneys

Cholakian, Kevin K.

Finn, Brian J

 

Court Documents

Request Dismissal

03/02/2020: Request Dismissal

Returned Mail

02/10/2020: Returned Mail

Notice

01/25/2020: Notice

Notice of Settlement

01/22/2020: Notice of Settlement

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

10/28/2019: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Proof of Service Summons

10/25/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Notice

10/16/2019: Notice

Case Management Conference Statement

10/16/2019: Case Management Conference Statement

Case Management Conference Statement

10/11/2019: Case Management Conference Statement

Proof of Service Summons

07/15/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Answer

07/12/2019: Answer

Proof of Service Summons

06/17/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

05/30/2019: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Summons

05/30/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

05/30/2019: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Dismissal Re: Notice of Settlement; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal; Party; Names; Rios, Ramon; Maldonado, Gonzalo; Cheema Freightlines, LLC; Hausmann, Michael John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Attorney: Finn, Brian J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • FinancialCheema Freightlines, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-25830; Cheema Freightlines, LLC; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialCheema Freightlines, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • FinancialRios, Ramon; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-12662; Rios, Ramon; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • FinancialRios, Ramon; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cheema Freightlines, LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINN BRIAN J.