Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 13:34:49 (UTC).

Producers Livestock Marketing Association vs Gustavo Del Toro

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Producers Livestock Marketing Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gustavo Del Toro. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David, McCabe, Brian and Proietti, Donald. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1019

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

McCabe, Brian

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Producers Livestock Marketing Association

Defendant

Del Toro, Gustavo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gomez, Michael J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Order.pdf

10/02/2020: Notice of Entry of Order.pdf

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

09/15/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

09/08/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Letter

09/04/2020: Letter

Application and Order for Examination

07/10/2020: Application and Order for Examination

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

07/08/2020: Memorandum: Points and Authorities

LA64441 RFJ.PDF

07/08/2020: LA64441 RFJ.PDF

Proof of Service

07/02/2020: Proof of Service

LA62966.Declaration of Rick O'Brien.pdf

07/01/2020: LA62966.Declaration of Rick O'Brien.pdf

Writ of Execution

06/17/2020: Writ of Execution

Warrant

12/31/2019: Warrant

Writ of Attachment

08/01/2019: Writ of Attachment

Abstract of Judgment

06/14/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment

06/14/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment

06/14/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Judgment

05/28/2019: Judgment

Request Court Judgment

05/17/2019: Request Court Judgment

Summons

03/11/2019: Summons

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Examination (Non Appeal); Original Type: Order of Examination (Non Appeal); Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff; Attorney: Gomez, Michael J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Examination (Non Appeal); Original Type: Order of Examination (Non Appeal); Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff; Attorney: Gomez, Michael J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Examination (Non Appeal); Original Type: Order of Examination (Non Appeal); Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff; Attorney: Gomez, Michael J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • FinancialProducers Livestock Marketing Association; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-06048; Producers Livestock Marketing Association; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • FinancialProducers Livestock Marketing Association; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Producers Livestock Marketing Association, a Utah corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomez, Michael J.