This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 08:30:21 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Mayra Morales

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mayra Morales. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1483

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Morales, Mayra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sherrill, Donald

 

Court Documents

1313872 Complaint 201904021717.pdf

04/04/2019: 1313872 Complaint 201904021717.pdf

1313872 CivilCaseCoverSheet 201904021717.pdf

04/04/2019: 1313872 CivilCaseCoverSheet 201904021717.pdf

1313872 Summons 201904021717.pdf

04/04/2019: 1313872 Summons 201904021717.pdf

1313872 DecReducedFees.pdf

04/04/2019: 1313872 DecReducedFees.pdf

Proof of Service Summons

05/20/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Declaration

09/12/2019: Declaration

Request Entry of Default

09/12/2019: Request Entry of Default

Affidavit

09/12/2019: Affidavit

Judgment Default by Court

09/13/2019: Judgment Default by Court

Abstract of Judgment

10/09/2019: Abstract of Judgment

1313872 coa.pdf

11/01/2021: 1313872 coa.pdf

1313872 moc.pdf

11/01/2021: 1313872 moc.pdf

Document Return Form

11/10/2021: Document Return Form

Writ of Execution

11/10/2021: Writ of Execution

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-04705; Hunt & Henriques Cost Account; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs after Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Info - Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-05300; Hunt & Henriques; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Morales, Mayra; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Awarded Against; Morales, Mayra; Amount; Damages: $1,842.91; Costs: $240.50; Total: $2083.41

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-08559; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherrill, Donald