Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 11:46:09 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Latasha Bradshaw

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Latasha Bradshaw. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2082

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Bradshaw, Latasha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Levy, Steve

Ritton, Jaime

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

08/29/2017: Abstract of Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

08/15/2017: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Judgment

08/15/2017: Judgment

Order

08/15/2017: Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

08/14/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

06/30/2017: Proof of Service

1123635 RJN.pdf

06/30/2017: 1123635 RJN.pdf

1123635 JOP Motion.pdf

06/30/2017: 1123635 JOP Motion.pdf

1123635 NTC.ENTRY.ORDER.pdf

06/30/2017: 1123635 NTC.ENTRY.ORDER.pdf

Order

06/19/2017: Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/19/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Motion.pdf

04/10/2017: Motion.pdf

Proof of Service

08/30/2016: Proof of Service

Answer

08/30/2016: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

08/30/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Summons

07/15/2016: Summons

Complaint

07/15/2016: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/15/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2017
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-04584; Hunt & Henriques; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Judgment Type: Judgment: Other; Party; Names; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Bradshaw, Latasha; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Awarded Against; Bradshaw, Latasha; Judgment Amount: $2,406.67; Amount; Damages: $2,004.17; Costs: $402.50; Total: $2406.67; Comment: Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff; Attorney: Levy, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2017-09892; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2016
  • FinancialBradshaw, Latasha; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-09365; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levy, Steve

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RITTON, JAIME Y.