This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 08:13:53 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Angelica Fuentes

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Angelica Fuentes. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David and Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1418

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Fuentes, Angelica M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DiPiero, Anthony

 

Court Documents

1379227 Complaint 202004170941.pdf

04/17/2020: 1379227 Complaint 202004170941.pdf

1379227 CivilCaseCoverSheet 202004170941.pdf

04/17/2020: 1379227 CivilCaseCoverSheet 202004170941.pdf

1379227 Summons 202004170941.pdf

04/17/2020: 1379227 Summons 202004170941.pdf

1379227 DecReducedFees 202004170938.pdf

04/17/2020: 1379227 DecReducedFees 202004170938.pdf

Proof of Service Summons

07/31/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Declaration

05/20/2021: Declaration

Declaration

05/20/2021: Declaration

Notice of Change of Address

05/20/2021: Notice of Change of Address

Request Entry of Default

05/20/2021: Request Entry of Default

Judgment Default by Court

06/10/2021: Judgment Default by Court

Abstract of Judgment

06/17/2021: Abstract of Judgment

Satisfication of Judgment

10/21/2021: Satisfication of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-02166; Hunt & Henriques Cost Acct; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Fuentes, Angelica M.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Awarded Against; Fuentes, Angelica M.; Amount; Damages: $1,940.30; Costs: $246.00; Total: $2186.30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-11679; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • FinancialPortfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW - ANTHONY DIPIERO