Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 21:58:10 (UTC).

Phuc Tran vs. Mary Camacho

Case Summary

On 10/22/2015 Phuc Tran filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mary Camacho. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3077

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tran, Phuc

Defendant

Camacho, Mary Martha

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

01/21/2016: Substitution of Attorney

Writ of Possession

11/19/2015: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Court

11/10/2015: Judgment Default by Court

Writ of Possession

11/06/2015: Writ of Possession

Affidavit

11/06/2015: Affidavit

Judgment Default by Clerk

11/06/2015: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Dismissal

11/06/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

11/06/2015: Request Entry of Default

Request Entry of Default

10/30/2015: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

10/30/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

10/30/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

10/28/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Summons - Filed

10/22/2015: Summons - Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/22/2015: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Tran, Phuc; Camacho, Mary Martha; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • FinancialTran, Phuc; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-10295; Merced County Eviction Service; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • FinancialTran, Phuc; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • FinancialTran, Phuc; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-09783; MCES; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • FinancialTran, Phuc; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Tran, Phuc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less