This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 17:49:24 (UTC).

Petition of: Raul Villegas

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Petition of Raul Villegas was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1044

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Villegas, Raul

Ortega, Raul Barajas

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Name Change

03/13/2019: Petition for Name Change

Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

03/13/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

Order Show Cause

03/13/2019: Order Show Cause

Notice of Hearing

03/20/2019: Notice of Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

04/03/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

04/03/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

04/24/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

06/18/2019: Proof of Publication

Ex-Parte Application

06/26/2019: Ex-Parte Application

Decree Changing Name

06/26/2019: Decree Changing Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketReview of Case Status; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialVillegas, Raul; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-03323; Villegas, Raul; $25.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialVillegas, Raul; Transaction Assessment; $25.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Party; Name; Villegas, Raul

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • FinancialVillegas, Raul; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-03115; Villegas, Raul; $165.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • FinancialVillegas, Raul; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-02664; Villegas, Raul; $200.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • FinancialVillegas, Raul; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-02033; Villegas, Raul; $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Hearing About Court Fee Waiver Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • FinancialVillegas, Raul; Transaction Assessment; $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver - Denied; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Name Change

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less