Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/07/2020 at 14:54:06 (UTC).

Paul Guedet vs. Jamia Walker

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 Paul Guedet filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jamia Walker. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3196

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guedet, Paul

Defendant

Walker, Jamia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Rickey D

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

09/28/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration

09/26/2018: Declaration

Substitution of Attorney

09/26/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration

09/26/2018: Declaration

Writ of Possession

12/13/2016: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

12/06/2016: Writ of Possession

Stipulated Judgment

12/01/2016: Stipulated Judgment

Notice of Hearing 2

11/01/2016: Notice of Hearing 2

Request to Set

11/01/2016: Request to Set

Proof of Service Summons

11/01/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

11/01/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service

10/25/2016: Proof of Service

Answer

10/25/2016: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

10/25/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

10/24/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Complaint

10/21/2016: Complaint

Summons

10/21/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowlegment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • FinancialGuedet, Paul; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-06489; MCES; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • FinancialGuedet, Paul; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment; Party; Names; Guedet, Paul; Walker, Jamia; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Judgment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • FinancialGuedet, Paul; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-14218; Guedet, Paul; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • FinancialGuedet, Paul; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wallace, Rickey D