Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 12:18:00 (UTC).

Patrick Mcgee vs. Richard Cox, et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2015 Patrick Mcgee filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Richard Cox. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3415

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mcgee, Patrick

Defendants

Sweeten, Kris

Cox, Richard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Rickey D

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession

02/26/2016: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

01/11/2016: Writ of Possession

Stipulated Judgment

01/11/2016: Stipulated Judgment

Unlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

12/31/2015: Unlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12/24/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Notice of Court Trial

12/16/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Request to Set

12/15/2015: Request to Set

Proof of Service Summons

12/15/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

12/15/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

12/15/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Order

12/10/2015: Order

Proof of Service

12/07/2015: Proof of Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12/07/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Answer

12/07/2015: Answer

Request

12/02/2015: Request

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

11/30/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Summons - Filed

11/25/2015: Summons - Filed

Complaint

11/25/2015: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment; Party; Names; Mcgee, Patrick; Cox, Richard; Sweeten, Kris; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • FinancialMcgee, Patrick; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-00232; Merced County Eviction Service; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • FinancialMcgee, Patrick; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Judgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • FinancialWallace, Rickey D; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-00025; Wallace, Rickey D; $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • FinancialWallace, Rickey D; Transaction Assessment; $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial: Unlawful Detainer; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Mcgee, Patrick; Attorney: Wallace, Rickey D; Defendant: Cox, Richard; Defendant: Sweeten, Kriss

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • FinancialMcgee, Patrick; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-10860; MCES; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • FinancialMcgee, Patrick; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Mcgee, Patrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wallace, Rickey D