This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/10/2020 at 17:16:08 (UTC).

Oportun Inc vs Jorge Mendoza

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jorge Mendoza. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0655

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc

Defendant

Mendoza, Jorge Edward

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail

04/17/2018: Returned Mail

Cert Mailing SC Notice of Entry Plf.

03/26/2018: Cert Mailing SC Notice of Entry Plf.

Cert Mailing SC Notice of Entry Def

03/26/2018: Cert Mailing SC Notice of Entry Def

Notice of Entry of Judgment

03/26/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Authorization to Appear

03/23/2018: Authorization to Appear

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

03/23/2018: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

02/26/2018: Proof of Service

Claim - Plaintiff

02/20/2018: Claim - Plaintiff

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Oportun Inc; Mendoza, Jorge Edward; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Oportun Inc; Awarded Against; Mendoza, Jorge Edward; Amount; Damages: $624.06; Costs: $95.00; Total: $719.06; Comment: Plus court costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Oportun Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • FinancialOportun Inc; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2018-03362; Oportun Inc; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • FinancialOportun Inc; Transaction Assessment; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim - Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant