This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/25/2020 at 18:03:08 (UTC).

Ocean West Nevada Corp vs Teresa Velez

Case Summary

On 07/10/2013 Ocean West Nevada Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Teresa Velez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dougherty, Frank and Baysinger, Robert F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4162

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dougherty, Frank

Baysinger, Robert F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ocean West Nevada Corp

Defendant

Velez, Teresa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • DocketReview; Original Type: Review; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketSatisfaction: Judgment - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; Ocean West Nevada Corp; Awarded Against; Velez, Teresa; Amount; Damages: $4,090.00; Attorney Fees: $65.00; Total: $4155.00; Party; Name; Velez, Teresa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; Ocean West Nevada Corp; Awarded Against; Velez, Teresa; Amount; Damages: $4,090.00; Attorney Fees: $65.00; Total: $4155.00; Party; Name; Velez, Teresa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • FinancialOcean West Nevada Corp; Counter Payment; Receipt # 468066; Eddings; $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • FinancialOcean West Nevada Corp; Transaction Assessment; $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketCourt Minutes: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketCourt Trial; Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2013
  • FinancialOcean West Nevada Corp; Counter Payment; Receipt # 452391; Velez, Teresa, Defendant; $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • FinancialOcean West Nevada Corp; Transaction Assessment; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketCourt Trial; Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Baysinger, Robert F.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • FinancialOcean West Nevada Corp; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • FinancialOcean West Nevada Corp; Counter Payment; Receipt # 437057; Ocean West, Nevada Corp.; $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • FinancialOcean West Nevada Corp; Transaction Assessment; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • DocketDocument: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DocketClaim - Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less