Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 21:18:12 (UTC).

Norman Delaney et al vs Ryland Homes et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2010 Norman Delaney filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Ryland Homes. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Flanagan, Hugh M., Kirihara, John, McCabe, Brian, Proietti, Donald and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1478

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Flanagan, Hugh M.

Kirihara, John

McCabe, Brian

Proietti, Donald

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bargas, Ramon

Sousa, Jenette

Lee, James

Walle, Jose

Gutierrez, Pascual

Moua, Houa

Lee, Rhoda

Sousa, Jose

Pitchford, Phyllis

Powell, Debra

Arias, Gustavo

Gonzalez, Arturo

Vargas, Leticia

Pitchford, Paul

Defendants

Orozco, Jose

Ryland Homes

Ryland Homes of California, Inc

Does 1 - 1000

Cross Defendant

Roes 1 - 500

Not Yet Classified

Ryland Homes of California, Inc., a

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorney

Nordstrom, Adrienne E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal & POS

03/23/2015: Notice of Entry of Dismissal & POS

Request Dismissal

03/02/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Dismissal

02/27/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Dismissal

02/23/2015: Request Dismissal

Public Historical Documents

01/06/2015: Public Historical Documents

Public Historical Documents

01/06/2015: Public Historical Documents

Public Historical Documents

11/19/2014: Public Historical Documents

Notice

10/22/2014: Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketReview Hearing Uncontested; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Judgment Type: Dismissal; Party; Names; Delaney, Norman; Hurtado, Bacillia; Lee, James; Lee, Rhoda; McCabe, Alex; McGowan, Patrick; McGowan, Benny; Moran, Clara; Moua, Houa; Moua, Houa; Orozco, Guillermo; Ryland Homes; Orozco, Adriana; Pitchford, Paul; Pitchford, Phyllis; Powell, Debra; Sousa, Jose; Sousa, Jenette; Teixeira, Stella; Bargas, Ramon; Vargas, Leticia; Vazquez, Manuel; Arias, Gustavo; Widick, Gerald; Widick, Deborah; Ryland Homes of California, Inc; Ryland Homes of California, Inc; Does 1 - 1000; Affholter, Jerry; Affholter, Edna; Millin, Juan; Walle, Jose; Walle, Salvador; Bass, Marilyn; Wegner, Noel; Ryland Homes of California, Inc., a; Roes 1 - 500; Avila, Yolanda; Orozco, Jose; Bennett, John; Fernandez, Jose; Gonzalez, Arturo; Gutierrez, Pascual; Hurtado, Jesus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketReview Hearing Uncontested; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued; Parties Present; Defendant; Attorney: Nordstrom, Adrienne E; Cross-Complainant; Attorney: Nordstrom, Adrienne E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • DocketJury Trial: Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • DocketStatus Review of Settlement; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPublic Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • FinancialDelaney, Norman; Counter Payment; Receipt # 145445; One Legal LLC; $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • FinancialDelaney, Norman; Transaction Assessment; $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ryland Homes of California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrienne E. Nordstrom