This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 16:31:34 (UTC).

Monica Eber, Petitioner vs. Nicholas Eber, Respondent

Case Summary

On 05/11/2015 Monica Eber, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Nicholas Eber, Respondent. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Castleton, Aaron and Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1464

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Castleton, Aaron

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monica Eber, Petitioner

Defendant

Nicholas Eber, Respondent

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

04/07/2016: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

04/07/2016: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice: Entry of Judgment

04/01/2016: Notice: Entry of Judgment

Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

01/19/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

Request for Order:Modification

01/19/2016: Request for Order:Modification

Income and Expense Declaration

01/14/2016: Income and Expense Declaration

Proof of Service by Mail

11/10/2015: Proof of Service by Mail

Order After Hearing

11/03/2015: Order After Hearing

* Public *

10/20/2015: * Public *

* Public *

10/20/2015: * Public *

Document: Other

10/20/2015: Document: Other

Declaration

10/20/2015: Declaration

Finding and Order After Hearing

10/06/2015: Finding and Order After Hearing

Proof of Service by Mail

09/29/2015: Proof of Service by Mail

Income and Expense Declaration

09/29/2015: Income and Expense Declaration

Ex Parte Declaration

09/25/2015: Ex Parte Declaration

Income and Expense Declaration

09/25/2015: Income and Expense Declaration

Declaration Under UCCJEA

09/25/2015: Declaration Under UCCJEA

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order: Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketService of Request for Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketService of Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Initial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less