This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 14:06:41 (UTC).

Miranda Gray, et al. vs Dominick Rufo, et al.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Miranda Gray, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dominick Rufo,. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and MacLaren, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0117

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

MacLaren, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gray, Miranda

Gray, Rickey

Gray, Charlene

Defendants

Rufo, Dominick Jeffrey

Bettencourt-Costa, Brandy

Hot Rod Diner, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brock, D Aaron

Price, Zachary Alexander

Defendant Attorney

Hancock, Aaron

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Gray.pdf

01/11/2022: Complaint - Gray.pdf

Notice of Related Cases.pdf

01/18/2023: Notice of Related Cases.pdf

66711NoticeCo00b5d56

11/21/2022: 66711NoticeCo00b5d56

66256NOTICEOF00f26a1

11/10/2022: 66256NOTICEOF00f26a1

Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

10/20/2022: Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

Proof of Service Summons

09/27/2022: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

09/27/2022: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

09/27/2022: Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

09/19/2022: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Plaintiffs' Notice of Posting Jury Fees.pdf

09/06/2022: Plaintiffs' Notice of Posting Jury Fees.pdf

63033NOTICEOF00c6cbd

09/06/2022: 63033NOTICEOF00c6cbd

Case Management Conference Statement

09/06/2022: Case Management Conference Statement

Case Management Conference Statement

09/01/2022: Case Management Conference Statement

Answer

03/16/2022: Answer

Proof of Service Summons

02/22/2022: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

01/20/2022: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Summons - Gray.pdf

01/11/2022: Summons - Gray.pdf

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Gray.pdf

01/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Gray.pdf

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: MacLaren, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff; Retained: Price, Zachary Alexander; Plaintiff; Retained: Price, Zachary Alexander; Plaintiff; Retained: Price, Zachary Alexander

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialGray, Charlene; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-23965; Gray, Charlene; $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • FinancialHot Rod Diner, Inc.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-07633; Hot Rod Diner, Inc.; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • FinancialHot Rod Diner, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialGray, Charlene; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-01566; Gray, Charlene; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialGray, Charlene; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less