This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 06:40:57 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Evangelina Carranza

Case Summary

On 02/18/2015 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Evangelina Carranza. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0570

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Carranza, Evangelina

 

Court Documents

Summons - Filed

02/18/2015: Summons - Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/18/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

02/18/2015: Complaint

Declaration

02/18/2015: Declaration

Declaration

02/18/2015: Declaration

Proof of Service Summons

03/24/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

07/20/2015: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

07/20/2015: Request Dismissal

Declaration

07/20/2015: Declaration

Exhibit

07/20/2015: Exhibit

Judgment Default by Clerk

07/20/2015: Judgment Default by Clerk

Document Return Form

05/24/2016: Document Return Form

Abstract of Judgment

02/02/2017: Abstract of Judgment

Writ of Execution

09/26/2019: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

05/08/2020: Writ of Execution

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialMidland Funding LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-05034; Midland Funding LLC; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialMidland Funding LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • FinancialMidland Funding LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-00642; Midland Funding LLC; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • FinancialMidland Funding LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Midland Funding LLC; Carranza, Evangelina; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Midland Funding LLC; Awarded Against; Carranza, Evangelina; Judgment Amount: $4,255.99; Amount; Damages: $4,009.99; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $246.00; Total: $4255.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • FinancialMidland Funding LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-01757; Midland Funding LLC; $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • FinancialMidland Funding LLC; Transaction Assessment; $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Midland Funding LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant