Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/12/2020 at 16:22:42 (UTC).

Micki Archuleta vs Merced Community College District

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 Micki Archuleta filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Merced Community College District. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5112

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Archuleta, Micki

Defendant

Merced Community College District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Shapazian, Larry Herb

 

Court Documents

Statement

03/06/2020: Statement

Request

03/06/2020: Request

Statement

03/06/2020: Statement

Memorandum:Points and Authorities

03/06/2020: Memorandum:Points and Authorities

Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication

03/06/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

03/02/2020: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Case Management Conference Statement

02/14/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

09/30/2019: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Case Management Conference Statement

09/13/2019: Case Management Conference Statement

Proof of Service

06/27/2019: Proof of Service

Notice

05/03/2019: Notice

Case Management Conference Statement

05/03/2019: Case Management Conference Statement

Answer

02/08/2019: Answer

Proof of Service Summons

01/14/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

12/21/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

12/21/2018: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Complaint

12/21/2018: Complaint

Summons - Filed

12/21/2018: Summons - Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialMerced Community College District; Government Exemption - GC6103; $530.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialMerced Community College District; Transaction Assessment; $530.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum: Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • FinancialArchuleta, Micki; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-07167; Archuleta, Micki; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • FinancialArchuleta, Micki; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver - Denied; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shapazian, Larry H.