This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 01:15:48 (UTC).

Michele Shelton vs Victor Ferro

Case Summary

On 06/26/2015 Michele Shelton filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Victor Ferro. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Proietti, Donald and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1836

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Proietti, Donald

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shelton, Michele

Defendant

Ferro, Victor James

 

Court Documents

Document: Other

03/01/2016: Document: Other

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

02/22/2016: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

10/29/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

* Public *

10/05/2015: * Public *

* Public *

10/05/2015: * Public *

Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/05/2015: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Subpoena

09/11/2015: Subpoena

Subpoena

07/28/2015: Subpoena

Proof of Service

07/08/2015: Proof of Service

Claim - Plaintiff

06/26/2015: Claim - Plaintiff

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full; Judicial Officer: Authority, Administrative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • FinancialFerro, Victor James; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-09239; Ferro, Victor James; $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • FinancialFerro, Victor James; Transaction Assessment; $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Party; Names; Shelton, Michele; Ferro, Victor James; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Shelton, Michele; Awarded Against; Ferro, Victor James; Judgment Amount: $1,007.07; Amount; Damages: $1,007.07; Costs: $70.00; Total: $1077.07; Comment: Plus Court Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Shelton, Michele; Defendant: Ferro, Victor James

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Shelton, Michele; Defendant: Ferro, Victor James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • FinancialFerro, Victor James; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-06851; Ferro, Victor James; $4.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • FinancialFerro, Victor James; Transaction Assessment; $4.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Shelton, Michele; Defendant: Ferro, Victor James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketPlaintiffs Claim; Served: 07/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • FinancialShelton, Michele; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-05897; Shelton, Michele; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • FinancialShelton, Michele; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim - Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less