This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/09/2020 at 20:51:29 (UTC).

Mary Gonzales vs. Angela Mendez

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 Mary Gonzales filed an Other lawsuit against Angela Mendez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3646

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gonzales, Mary Louise

Respondent

Mendez, Angela

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Elder/Dependent Abuse RO

10/26/2017: Request for Elder/Dependent Abuse RO

Temporary Restraining Order

10/30/2017: Temporary Restraining Order

Notice of Hearing

10/30/2017: Notice of Hearing

Proof of Service

11/01/2017: Proof of Service

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/28/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Order After Hearing

11/28/2017: Order After Hearing

Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

12/04/2017: Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

Motion

12/05/2017: Motion

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12/05/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Subsequent Petition

12/05/2017: Subsequent Petition

Temporary Restraining Order

12/07/2017: Temporary Restraining Order

Notice of Hearing

12/07/2017: Notice of Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2018: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

01/09/2018: Notice

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

02/09/2018: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Order After Hearing

02/13/2018: Order After Hearing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Settlement Conference; Party; Names; Gonzales, Mary Louise; Mendez, Angela

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • FinancialMendez, Angela; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-06290; Mendez, Angela; $6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • FinancialMendez, Angela; Transaction Assessment; $6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Party; Names; Gonzales, Mary Louise; Mendez, Angela

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner: Gonzales, Mary Louise

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Elder/Dependent Abuse RO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less