Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 00:06:23 (UTC).

Mario Bellinghausen,Ivette Davalos vs. Jennifer Davalos

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Mario Bellinghausen,Ivette Davalos filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jennifer Davalos. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0617

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Davalos, Ivette

Bellinghausen, Mario

Defendant

Davalos, Jennifer

 

Court Documents

Certicate of Mailing

08/19/2019: Certicate of Mailing

Certicate of Mailing

08/19/2019: Certicate of Mailing

Certicate of Mailing

08/19/2019: Certicate of Mailing

Notice of Entry of Judgment

08/16/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

08/15/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

07/09/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

06/13/2019: Motion

Certicate of Mailing

06/06/2019: Certicate of Mailing

Certicate of Mailing

06/06/2019: Certicate of Mailing

Certicate of Mailing

06/06/2019: Certicate of Mailing

Notice of Entry of Judgment

06/06/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/04/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

05/06/2019: Proof of Service

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

04/25/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

03/14/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

03/13/2019: Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

Claim - Plaintiff

02/11/2019: Claim - Plaintiff

Claim - Plaintiff

02/11/2019: Claim - Plaintiff

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Bellinghausen, Mario; Awarded Against; Davalos, Jennifer; Judgment Amount: $56.00; Status: Active; Status Date: 08/15/2019; Status Comment: plus costs: $50.00 filing fee $0.00 service fee; Status Comment: plus costs: $50.00 filing fee $0.00 service fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Bellinghausen, Mario; Davalos, Ivette; Awarded Against; Davalos, Jennifer; Judgment Amount: $1,722.73; Amount; Status: Judgment Vacated; Status Date: 08/15/2019; Status Comment: as of 8/15/2019; Status Comment: as of 8/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Bellinghausen, Mario; Defendant: Davalos, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Bellinghausen, Mario; Defendant: Davalos, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • FinancialDavalos, Jennifer; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-05802; Davalos, Jennifer; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • FinancialDavalos, Jennifer; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Bellinghausen, Mario; Davalos, Ivette; Awarded Against; Davalos, Jennifer; Judgment Amount: $1,722.73; Amount; Status: Active; Status Date: 06/04/2019; Status Comment: Plus costs of: $50.00 filing fee. $0.00 service fee.; Status Comment: Plus costs of: $50.00 filing fee. $0.00 service fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Bellinghausen, Mario

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Bellinghausen, Mario

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Bellinghausen, Mario

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • FinancialBellinghausen, Mario; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-01489; Bellinghausen, Mario; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • FinancialBellinghausen, Mario; Transaction Assessment; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim - Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less