This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 18:19:44 (UTC).

Maria Maldonado Guillen vs Food 4 Less of California, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 Maria Maldonado Guillen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Food 4 Less of California, Inc . This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4096

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maldonado Guillen, Maria De Jesus

Defendants

Food 4 Less of California, Inc.

Alpha Beta Company

Ralphs Grocery Company

Food 4 Less

Paq, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rafii, Daniel J

 

Court Documents

Complaint.text.pdf

12/23/2021: Complaint.text.pdf

CCCS.text.pdf

12/23/2021: CCCS.text.pdf

Summons.text.pdf

12/23/2021: Summons.text.pdf

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

01/10/2022: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialMaldonado Guillen, Maria De Jesus; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-00502; Maldonado Guillen, Maria De Jesus; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialMaldonado Guillen, Maria De Jesus; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paq, Inc. dba Food 4 Less and/or Rancho San Miguel Markets, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA BETA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant