Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 12:19:22 (UTC).

Maria Jimenez, et al. vs Volvo Rents, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2015 Maria Jimenez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Volvo Rents, Inc . This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Proietti, Donald. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2012

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jimenez, Aellen Gema

Jimenez, Brando Luis

Jimenez, Aime Jasmine

Jimenez, Maria I.

Jimenez, Luis Andres

Jimenez, Nimzy Hazel

Jimenez, Jose Luis, Junior

Defendants

Teichert Inc.

Blueline Rental, LLC

Volvo Rents, Inc.

A. Teichert & Sons

Teichert Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rickard, Jeff, Esquire

Defendant Attorney

Murphy, Jonathan R

 

Court Documents

Request Dismissal

08/21/2015: Request Dismissal

Notice

08/17/2015: Notice

Proof of Service Summons

07/22/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

07/22/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

07/21/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

07/21/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Application

07/17/2015: Application

Application

07/17/2015: Application

Application

07/17/2015: Application

Application

07/17/2015: Application

Notice of Inclusion CMC

07/15/2015: Notice of Inclusion CMC

Complaint

07/15/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/15/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

07/15/2015: Summons - Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Served: 07/20/20154:41 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Served: 07/20/20154:41 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Served: 07/17/20152:50 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • FinancialJimenez, Maria I.; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-06463; One Legal LLC; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • FinancialJimenez, Maria I.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Jimenez, Maria I.; Served: 07/20/20154:41 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teichert, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TEICHERT CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUELINE RENTALS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A. Teichert & Son, Inc., dba Teichert Construction is a litigant