Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 17:01:45 (UTC).

Makayla England vs. Steve Martinez Maldonado

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Makayla England filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Steve Martinez Maldonado. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Seymour, Shelly and Martinez, Maria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0390

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Seymour, Shelly

Martinez, Maria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Makayla England

Defendants

Steve Maldonado

Steve Martinez Maldonado

 

Court Documents

Responsive Declaration

03/12/2021: Responsive Declaration

Responsive Declaration

03/12/2021: Responsive Declaration

Request for Order:Initial

03/01/2021: Request for Order:Initial

Summons - Filed

03/01/2021: Summons - Filed

Declaration Under UCCJEA

03/01/2021: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Petition

03/01/2021: Petition

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

03/01/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order: Initial; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling; Judicial Officer: Martinez, Maria; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Initial; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less