This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/23/2020 at 20:11:56 (UTC).

Madison Frieson vs Matthew Bettis

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 Madison Frieson filed an Other lawsuit against Matthew Bettis. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4364

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frieson, Madison Starlin

Defendant

Bettis, Matthew Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Struck, James D.

Defendant Attorney

Aharonian, Richard

 

Court Documents

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

03/16/2020: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Notice

11/21/2019: Notice

Answer

11/21/2019: Answer

Proof of Service Summons

10/24/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

10/10/2019: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/09/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

10/09/2019: Summons

Complaint

10/09/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketStatus Review of Settlement; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff; Attorney: Struck, James D.; Defendant; Attorney: Aharonian, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • FinancialBettis, Matthew Steven; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-28957; Bettis, Matthew Steven; $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • FinancialBettis, Matthew Steven; Transaction Assessment; $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • FinancialFrieson, Madison Starlin; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-25152; Frieson, Madison S.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • FinancialFrieson, Madison Starlin; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less