This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 07:16:56 (UTC).

Ma Ana Basilia Arbo-Tiu, et al. vs Roberto Hernandez, et al.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Ma Ana Basilia Arbo-Tiu, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Roberto Hernandez,. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2001

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arbo-Tiu, Ma Ana Basilia

Tiu, Jerry R.

Defendants

Hernandez, Roberto

Hernandez, Jamie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herr, Leonard C

 

Court Documents

Complaint

07/01/2022: Complaint

Summons

07/01/2022: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/01/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

07/11/2022: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Proof of Service Summons

08/16/2022: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

08/16/2022: Proof of Service Summons

Request Dismissal

09/07/2022: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

09/07/2022: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

12/14/2022: Request Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal; Party; Names; Arbo-Tiu, Ma Ana Basilia; Hernandez, Roberto; Tiu, Jerry R.; Hernandez, Jamie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialTiu, Jerry R.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-17307; Tiu, Jerry R.; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialTiu, Jerry R.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Herr, Leonard C.