This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/21/2020 at 12:53:01 (UTC).

Lynna M Gutierrez vs Raul Gutierrez Jr

Case Summary

On 08/18/2005 Lynna M Gutierrez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Raul Gutierrez Jr. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Aitchison, Casey, Seymour, Shelly and Corman, Gerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **4942

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Aitchison, Casey

Seymour, Shelly

Corman, Gerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynna M Gutierrez

Defendant

Raul Gutierrez Jr

 

Court Documents

Income and Expense Declaration

03/01/2016: Income and Expense Declaration

Declaration Under UCCJEA

03/01/2016: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

03/01/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Request for Order:Modification

03/03/2016: Request for Order:Modification

Proof of Service

03/11/2016: Proof of Service

Public Historical Documents

03/14/2016: Public Historical Documents

Proof of Service

03/15/2016: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

04/01/2016: Proof of Service

Department Child Support Services Support Calculations

04/05/2016: Department Child Support Services Support Calculations

Order After Hearing

04/07/2016: Order After Hearing

Proof of Service by Mail

04/14/2016: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDepartment Child Support Services Support Calculations

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order: Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPublic Historical Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketNotice of Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • DocketReview; Original Type: Review; Judicial Officer: Corman, Gerald; Hearing Time: 08:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • DocketOrder After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • DocketNotice of Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less