This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 18:00:12 (UTC).

Lowell Dickson vs Foster Farms, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 Lowell Dickson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Foster Farms, LLC,. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2629

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dickson, Lowell

Defendants

United Farm Workers

Foster Poultry Farms, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Angelini, Brian

Defendant Attorney

Helsley, Michael S

 

Court Documents

62197Complain00eea41

08/18/2022: 62197Complain00eea41

62197CivilCas01be029

08/18/2022: 62197CivilCas01be029

62197SummonsS02ef073

08/18/2022: 62197SummonsS02ef073

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

08/23/2022: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Proof of Service Summons

09/12/2022: Proof of Service Summons

Request Dismissal

10/06/2022: Request Dismissal

Order

10/18/2022: Order

62197Complain00eea41

08/18/2022: 62197Complain00eea41

Answer

11/07/2022: Answer

66274NOTICEAN00c96b7

11/10/2022: 66274NOTICEAN00c96b7

Notice

02/14/2023: Notice

Case Management Conference Statement

02/21/2023: Case Management Conference Statement

Case Management Conference Statement

02/24/2023: Case Management Conference Statement

Notice

03/07/2023: Notice

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

03/13/2023: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialFoster Poultry Farms, LLC.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2023-06624; Foster Poultry Farms, LLC.; $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialFoster Poultry Farms, LLC.; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialFoster Poultry Farms, LLC.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-29971; Foster Poultry Farms, LLC.; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialFoster Poultry Farms, LLC.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • FinancialDickson, Lowell; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-21647; Dickson, Lowell; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • FinancialDickson, Lowell; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less