This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:02:01 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp., vs Luis Vargas, Junior

Case Summary

On 05/04/2016 Lobel Financial Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Luis Vargas, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark and Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1282

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation

Lobel Financial Corp.,

Defendant

Vargas, Luis Fernando, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lobel, Gary Dean

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/04/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

05/04/2016: Summons

Complaint

05/04/2016: Complaint

Proof of Service

05/26/2016: Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal of Does

07/25/2016: Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Entry of Default

07/25/2016: Request for Entry of Default

Declaration of Dianne Cravens C.C.P.585

07/25/2016: Declaration of Dianne Cravens C.C.P.585

Judgment Default by Court

08/01/2016: Judgment Default by Court

Memorandum

09/30/2016: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

10/06/2016: Writ of Execution

Abstract of Judgment

10/19/2016: Abstract of Judgment

Writ of Execution

08/14/2017: Writ of Execution

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp.,; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-05628; Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp.,; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp.,; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-05282; Lobel Financial; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp.,; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Lobel Financial Corp.,; Vargas, Luis Fernando, Junior; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Lobel Financial Corp.,; Awarded Against; Vargas, Luis Fernando, Junior; Judgment Amount: $9,842.41; Amount; Damages: $8,033.53; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 18.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $683.88; Attorney Fees: $800.00; Costs: $325.00; Total: $9842.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp.,; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-05445; Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp.,; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOBEL, GARY D