This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:05:26 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation vs Kelly Bousquet

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 Lobel Financial Corp , A California Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kelly Bousquet. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0625

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation

Defendant

Bousquet, Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Huang, Shiao-Wen

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

02/14/2018: Summons

Complaint

02/14/2018: Complaint

Declaration

02/14/2018: Declaration

Proof of Service Summons

03/20/2018: Proof of Service Summons

Request Dismissal

05/18/2018: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

05/18/2018: Request Entry of Default

Declaration

05/18/2018: Declaration

Declaration

05/18/2018: Declaration

Declaration

05/18/2018: Declaration

Judgment Default by Court

05/24/2018: Judgment Default by Court

Abstract of Judgment

06/25/2018: Abstract of Judgment

Memorandum

05/08/2019: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

05/29/2019: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

04/13/2020: Writ of Execution

Satisfication of Judgment

09/30/2021: Satisfication of Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-02705; Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2018-03588; Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; Bousquet, Kelly; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; Awarded Against; Bousquet, Kelly; Amount; Damages: $2,184.05; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $112.69; Attorney Fees: $200.00; Costs: $280.00; Total: $2776.74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2018-03160; Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • FinancialLobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUANG SHIAO-WEN