Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 20:08:19 (UTC).

Livingstone Pacific Associates vs. Shawn Perkins, Senior, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2015 Livingstone Pacific Associates filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Shawn Perkins, Senior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1262

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Livingstone Pacific Associates

Defendants

Duran, Krista

Perkins, Shawn, Senior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Handy, Alexander

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution

05/11/2019: Writ of Execution

Other Documents Not Listed

04/19/2019: Other Documents Not Listed

Memorandum

07/27/2018: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

03/15/2017: Writ of Execution

Notice of Change of Address

03/09/2017: Notice of Change of Address

Declaration

10/02/2015: Declaration

Request Dismissal

10/02/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Court Judgment

09/30/2015: Request Court Judgment

Judgment Default by Clerk

05/26/2015: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Dismissal

05/26/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

05/26/2015: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

05/26/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

05/26/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

05/26/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

05/05/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Complaint

05/04/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/04/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

05/04/2015: Summons - Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • FinancialLivingstone Pacific Associates; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-02130; Kimball, Tirey & St John; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • FinancialLivingstone Pacific Associates; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • FinancialLivingstone Pacific Associates; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-01416; Kimball Tirey & St. John; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • FinancialLivingstone Pacific Associates; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • FinancialLivingstone Pacific Associates; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-03958; Kimball Tirey & St. John; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • FinancialLivingstone Pacific Associates; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Livingstone Pacific Associates; Served: 05/06/2015; Served: 05/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less