This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:35:00 (UTC).

Lendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company vs Claudio Cortez

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Lendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Claudio Cortez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4027

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company

Defendant

Cortez, Claudio Cesar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Macleod, James

 

Court Documents

2999618_245Complaint

09/16/2019: 2999618_245Complaint

2999618_172CivilCove

09/16/2019: 2999618_172CivilCove

2999618_132Decrevenu

09/16/2019: 2999618_132Decrevenu

2999618_260Summons32

09/16/2019: 2999618_260Summons32

Proof of Service Summons

10/02/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

11/15/2019: Request Entry of Default

Request Court Judgment

03/17/2021: Request Court Judgment

Request Dismissal

03/17/2021: Request Dismissal

Declaration

03/17/2021: Declaration

Declaration

03/17/2021: Declaration

Notice of Change of Address

03/17/2021: Notice of Change of Address

Affidavit

03/17/2021: Affidavit

Judgment Default by Court

03/26/2021: Judgment Default by Court

Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

05/12/2021: Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

Writ of Execution

06/07/2021: Writ of Execution

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialLendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-01842; Provest LLC; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialLendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs after Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Lendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company; Cortez, Claudio Cesar; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Lendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company; Awarded Against; Cortez, Claudio Cesar; Amount; Damages: $5,166.17; Costs: $343.51; Total: $5509.68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Foster, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Court Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • FinancialLendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-22908; Lendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • FinancialLendmark Financial Services LLC, a limited liability company; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant