This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/28/2020 at 22:36:33 (UTC).

Lena L Coe vs Derek L Coe St

Case Summary

On 02/14/2014 Lena L Coe filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Derek L Coe St. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald and Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8811

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lena L Coe

Defendant

Derek L Coe St

 

Court Documents

Notice: Entry of Judgment

07/11/2017: Notice: Entry of Judgment

Judgment

07/11/2017: Judgment

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

07/03/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Returned Mail

06/26/2017: Returned Mail

Returned Mail

06/20/2017: Returned Mail

Certificate of Mailing

06/07/2017: Certificate of Mailing

Notice Court Hearing

06/05/2017: Notice Court Hearing

Amended M/O dtd Jun 5, 17

06/05/2017: Amended M/O dtd Jun 5, 17

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/05/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Statement Issues and Contentions

05/25/2017: Statement Issues and Contentions

Returned Mail

03/21/2017: Returned Mail

Notice: Trial Setting Conference

03/06/2017: Notice: Trial Setting Conference

Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

02/16/2017: Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

Proof of Service by Mail

02/16/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

At Issue Memorandum

02/16/2017: At Issue Memorandum

Response

02/14/2017: Response

Public Historical Documents

08/31/2015: Public Historical Documents

Returned Mail

01/21/2015: Returned Mail

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Party; Names; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; Awarded Against; Comment: see attached image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial: Short Cause; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Court Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Court Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Issues and Contentions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPublic Historical Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Void

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketSummons - Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution Without Children

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less