This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/26/2020 at 13:44:15 (UTC).

Kristina Good vs Brian Good

Case Summary

On 02/10/2011 Kristina Good filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Brian Good. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Seymour, Shelly and Wakefield, Catherine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8267

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Seymour, Shelly

Wakefield, Catherine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristina Good

Defendant

Brian Good

 

Court Documents

* Public *

12/02/2015: * Public *

Public Historical Documents

02/07/2017: Public Historical Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

08/17/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Declaration Under UCCJEA

08/17/2017: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Request for Order:Modification

08/17/2017: Request for Order:Modification

Proof of Service

08/30/2017: Proof of Service

Declaration

10/23/2017: Declaration

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

10/26/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

10/31/2017: Stipulation and Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/07/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order: Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling; Judicial Officer: Wakefield, Catherine; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: CCRC Dropped From Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2011
  • DocketDeclaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketNotice/Acknowledgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • DocketResponse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution Without Children

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less