This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 17:01:57 (UTC).

Jose Nolasco vs. Dail Gee

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 Jose Nolasco filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Dail Gee. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0111

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nolasco, Jose

Defendant

Gee, Dail

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/15/2016: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/15/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

01/15/2016: Summons - Filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

01/20/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

01/20/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Proof of Service Summons

02/01/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Request

02/01/2016: Request

Notice of Hearing

02/01/2016: Notice of Hearing

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

02/17/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Request Entry of Default

03/15/2016: Request Entry of Default

Document Return

03/15/2016: Document Return

Document Return Form

03/15/2016: Document Return Form

Request Entry of Default

03/21/2016: Request Entry of Default

Document Return Form

03/22/2016: Document Return Form

Document Return Form

03/22/2016: Document Return Form

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • FinancialNolasco, Jose; Fee Waiver; $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketHearing: In Camera; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Nolasco, Jose

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • FinancialNolasco, Jose; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less