This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:33:36 (UTC).

Jose Chavez-Alvarez, Petitioner vs. Victoria Vasquez, Respondent

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 Jose Chavez-Alvarez, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Victoria Vasquez, Respondent. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Castleton, Aaron, Shaver, Donald and Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1007

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Castleton, Aaron

Shaver, Donald

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Chavez-Alvarez, Petitioner

Defendant

Victoria Vasquez, Respondent

 

Court Documents

CCRC Agreement

05/25/2017: CCRC Agreement

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

05/25/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

05/03/2017: Proof of Service

Request for Order:Modification

04/13/2017: Request for Order:Modification

Order Granting Fee Waiver - Subsequent

04/12/2017: Order Granting Fee Waiver - Subsequent

Declaration Under UCCJEA

04/12/2017: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Declaration Under UCCJEA

12/21/2016: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12/21/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Notice: Entry of Judgment

08/16/2016: Notice: Entry of Judgment

Judgment

08/16/2016: Judgment

Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

08/12/2016: Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

Request Entry of Default

08/12/2016: Request Entry of Default

Income and Expense Declaration

08/10/2016: Income and Expense Declaration

Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

08/10/2016: Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

Proof of Service Summons

04/26/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Summons - Filed

04/14/2016: Summons - Filed

Petition: Amended

04/14/2016: Petition: Amended

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

04/07/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order: Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCCRC Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling; Judicial Officer: Castleton, Aaron; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: CCRC Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Fee Waiver - Subsequent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver - Subsequent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less