This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 16:26:10 (UTC).

John Roush vs Ramneek Kahlon et al.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 John Roush filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ramneek Kahlon. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2834

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roush, John Virgil

Defendants

Kahlon, Sukwinder

Kahlon, Ranjit

Kahlon, Ramneek Kaur

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Atanous, Sargis G.

Defendant Attorney

O'Driscoll, Brian H

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/01/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/01/2020: Complaint

Summons

10/01/2020: Summons

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

10/06/2020: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Proof of Service Summons

12/14/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

12/14/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

12/14/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Answer

01/14/2021: Answer

Case Management Conference Statement

01/14/2021: Case Management Conference Statement

Notice

01/14/2021: Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialKahlon, Ramneek Kaur; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2021-02762; Kahlon, Ramneek Kaur; $1455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialKahlon, Ramneek Kaur; Transaction Assessment; $1455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialRoush, John Virgil; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-24785; Roush, John Virgil; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialRoush, John Virgil; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Driscoll, Brian H.