This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/08/2020 at 22:17:39 (UTC).

Jessica Saenz, Petitioner vs. Angel Saenz, Respondent

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Jessica Saenz, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Angel Saenz, Respondent. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Luna, Judy, Orosco, Theresa, Castleton, Aaron, Shaver, Donald and Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2071

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Luna, Judy

Orosco, Theresa

Castleton, Aaron

Shaver, Donald

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Saenz, Petitioner

Defendant

Angel Saenz, Respondent

 

Court Documents

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/05/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

10/16/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration Under UCCJEA

08/15/2019: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Request for Order:Modification

08/13/2019: Request for Order:Modification

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

08/02/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

07/16/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

07/16/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Finding and Order After Hearing

06/20/2019: Finding and Order After Hearing

Declaration

06/14/2019: Declaration

Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

09/25/2018: Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

09/25/2018: Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

Judgment Checklist

09/25/2018: Judgment Checklist

Request Entry of Default

09/25/2018: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

08/30/2018: Proof of Service Summons

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

08/09/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Declaration Under UCCJEA

08/09/2018: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Petition

08/09/2018: Petition

Summons - Filed

08/09/2018: Summons - Filed

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order: Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling; Judicial Officer: Orosco, Theresa; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: CCRC Dropped From Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCCRC Review; Judicial Officer: Luna, Judy; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: CCRC Dropped From Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinding and Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order: Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Checklist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less