Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 20:52:04 (UTC).

Jenq Wen, et al vs. Isabel Garcia , et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2015 Jenq Wen filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Isabel Garcia . This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John, McCabe, Brian and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0305

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

McCabe, Brian

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wen, Jenq Rong

Defendant

Garcia , Isabel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morse, Cindy R

 

Court Documents

Memorandum

06/11/2015: Memorandum

Certificate of Mailing

04/28/2015: Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

04/28/2015: Certificate of Mailing

Writ of Possession

03/17/2015: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

03/05/2015: Writ of Possession

Judgment by Court

03/05/2015: Judgment by Court

Judgment by Court

03/05/2015: Judgment by Court

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

03/03/2015: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

* Public *

02/26/2015: * Public *

Notice of Court Trial

02/17/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Court Trial

02/17/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Proof of Service

02/11/2015: Proof of Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

02/11/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Proof of Service Summons

02/05/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

02/05/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Application

02/02/2015: Application

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/30/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

01/30/2015: Summons - Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • FinancialWen, Jenq Rong; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-01967; Citi Bank Personal Money Order; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • FinancialWen, Jenq Rong; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Party; Names; Wen, Jenq Rong; Garcia , Isabel; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2015
  • FinancialWen, Jenq Rong; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-00961; Central Collections; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • FinancialWen, Jenq Rong; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • FinancialWen, Jenq Rong; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-00906; Central Collections LLC; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • FinancialWen, Jenq Rong; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Wen, Jenq Rong; Served: 02/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morse, Cindy R