This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 09:53:00 (UTC).

Jazz Sharma vs. Karan Sharma

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Jazz Sharma filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Karan Sharma. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Seymour, Shelly and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1527

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Seymour, Shelly

Shaver, Donald

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

01/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Response

01/26/2021: Response

Proof of Service

01/26/2021: Proof of Service

Non-Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

01/25/2021: Non-Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2021: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

01/20/2021: Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

01/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

01/19/2021: Declaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

Income and Expense Declaration

01/19/2021: Income and Expense Declaration

Responsive Declaration

01/19/2021: Responsive Declaration

Declaration

01/15/2021: Declaration

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

12/15/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

12/14/2020: Notice

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Order:Initial

11/09/2020: Request for Order:Initial

Proof of Service by Mail

11/05/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

11/05/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Request Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

11/05/2020: Request Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Original Type: Further Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order: Initial; Original Type: Request for Order: Initial; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration: Service: Decl/Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Checklist

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Partial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less