This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/06/2020 at 01:21:45 (UTC).

Jaxon Enterprises vs Security Paving Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 Jaxon Enterprises filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Security Paving Company, Inc. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Proietti, Donald. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1001

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jaxon Enterprises

Le Grand Asphalt

Defendants

Security Paving Company, Inc.

Federal Insurance Company

State of California, Department of Transportation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Maire, Wayne H

Defendant Attorneys

Shaffer, Robert H

Kelly, Steven T

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/07/2016: Complaint

Summons

04/07/2016: Summons

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

04/11/2016: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/11/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Substitution of Attorney

04/15/2016: Substitution of Attorney

Document Return Form

05/18/2016: Document Return Form

Answer/Response/Denial - No Fee

05/24/2016: Answer/Response/Denial - No Fee

Answer/Response/Denial - First Appearance Fee

06/02/2016: Answer/Response/Denial - First Appearance Fee

Answer/Response/Denial - First Appearance Fee

06/02/2016: Answer/Response/Denial - First Appearance Fee

Cross Complaint (No Fee)

06/02/2016: Cross Complaint (No Fee)

Request for Entire Action

08/08/2016: Request for Entire Action

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal; Party; Names; Jaxon Enterprises; Security Paving Company, Inc.; State of California, Department of Transportation; Federal Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • FinancialSecurity Paving Company, Inc.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-06898; Security Paving Company, Inc.; $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • FinancialSecurity Paving Company, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • FinancialJaxon Enterprises; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-04099; Jaxon Enterprises; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • FinancialJaxon Enterprises; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNIA-DEPARTMENT OF PARKS is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Taylor Kelly