This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 22:44:11 (UTC).

James Brindeiro vs. Felipe Coralevo

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 James Brindeiro filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Felipe Coralevo. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1541

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danbom, Paul

Brindeiro, James

Defendant

Coralevo, Felipe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

Summons - Filed

05/29/2015: Summons - Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/29/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

06/04/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

06/04/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

06/04/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Proof of Service Summons

06/16/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

06/16/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

06/16/2015: Request Entry of Default

Judgment Default by Clerk

06/16/2015: Judgment Default by Clerk

Writ of Possession

06/16/2015: Writ of Possession

Request Court Judgment

06/25/2015: Request Court Judgment

Declaration

06/25/2015: Declaration

Writ of Possession

06/26/2015: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Court

06/29/2015: Judgment Default by Court

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Brindeiro, James; Coralevo, Felipe; Danbom, Paul; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • FinancialBrindeiro, James; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-05491; Doerksen Investigations; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • FinancialBrindeiro, James; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • FinancialBrindeiro, James; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-04843; Bruce Doerksen; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • FinancialBrindeiro, James; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Brindeiro, James; Served: 06/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowe, Anthony Drew