Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 20:28:16 (UTC).

JAM Sisters LP vs. Bernice Sanchez-Bravo

Case Summary

On 02/22/2016 JAM Sisters LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Bernice Sanchez-Bravo. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0527

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAM Sisters LP

Defendant

Sanchez-Bravo, Bernice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Rickey D

 

Court Documents

Judgment Default by Court

03/30/2016: Judgment Default by Court

Writ of Possession

03/23/2016: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Clerk

03/22/2016: Judgment Default by Clerk

Affidavit

03/22/2016: Affidavit

Request Dismissal

03/22/2016: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

03/22/2016: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

03/22/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

03/22/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Returned Mail

03/07/2016: Returned Mail

Returned Mail

03/02/2016: Returned Mail

Order

03/01/2016: Order

Request

03/01/2016: Request

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

02/24/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Complaint

02/22/2016: Complaint

Summons

02/22/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/22/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; JAM Sisters LP; Sanchez-Bravo, Bernice; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • FinancialJAM Sisters LP; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-03376; JAM Sisters LP; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • FinancialJAM Sisters LP; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • FinancialJAM Sisters LP; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • FinancialJAM Sisters LP; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-02268; JAM Sisters LP; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • FinancialJAM Sisters LP; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wallace, Rickey D