This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 22:44:14 (UTC).

In Re: A. Negrete

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 In Re A Negrete was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Proietti, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1565

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Petitioner

J. G. Wentworth Originations, LLC

Defendant

A. Negrete

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Scharg, Erin M.

Eason, Matthew

 

Court Documents

Notice

07/20/2015: Notice

Order

07/07/2015: Order

Notice

06/30/2015: Notice

Notice

06/22/2015: Notice

Notice of Hearing

06/11/2015: Notice of Hearing

Document Return Form

06/10/2015: Document Return Form

Petition Approval of Transfer of Structered Settle

06/02/2015: Petition Approval of Transfer of Structered Settle

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/29/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketPetition; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner; Attorney: Scharg, Erin M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • FinancialJ. G. Wentworth Originations, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-05364; Eason & Tambornini; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • FinancialJ. G. Wentworth Originations, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • FinancialJ. G. Wentworth Originations, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-04940; Eason & Tambornini; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • FinancialJ. G. Wentworth Originations, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less