Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/20/2020 at 19:28:14 (UTC).

Hollis Properties II, LLC vs. Victor Lane

Case Summary

On 03/24/2006 Hollis Properties II, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Victor Lane. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacobs, Harry and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3277

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2006

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacobs, Harry

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Defendant

Lane, Victor

 

Court Documents

Notice of Renewal of Judgment

02/19/2016: Notice of Renewal of Judgment

Proof of Service

01/11/2016: Proof of Service

Notice of Renewal of Judgment

12/28/2015: Notice of Renewal of Judgment

Writ of Execution

12/01/2011: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

10/26/2011: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

03/03/2009: Writ of Execution

Memorandum

03/03/2009: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

01/02/2009: Writ of Execution

Memorandum

01/02/2009: Memorandum

Memorandum

07/22/2008: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

07/21/2008: Writ of Execution

Abstract of Judgment

11/13/2006: Abstract of Judgment

Assignment of Judgment

11/13/2006: Assignment of Judgment

Substitution of Attorney

05/26/2006: Substitution of Attorney

Request Entry of Default

04/20/2006: Request Entry of Default

Order

04/04/2006: Order

Summons - Filed

03/24/2006: Summons - Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/24/2006: Civil Case Cover Sheet

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Lane, Victor; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less