This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:42:36 (UTC).

Harco National Insurance vs Lisa Ramos

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Harco National Insurance filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lisa Ramos. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1507

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harco National Insurance

Defendant

Ramos, Lisa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haines, Todd F

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution

02/18/2021: Writ of Execution

Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

01/07/2021: Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

Writ of Execution

05/13/2020: Writ of Execution

Search Request Completed

05/12/2020: Search Request Completed

Certificate of Facts Unsatisfied Judgment

03/23/2020: Certificate of Facts Unsatisfied Judgment

Writ of Execution

09/30/2019: Writ of Execution

Abstract of Judgment

09/25/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Request Dismissal

09/12/2019: Request Dismissal

Judgment Default by Court

09/11/2019: Judgment Default by Court

Declaration

09/10/2019: Declaration

Declaration

09/10/2019: Declaration

Declaration

09/10/2019: Declaration

Request Court Judgment

09/10/2019: Request Court Judgment

Request Entry of Default

05/29/2019: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

05/09/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/09/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

04/09/2019: Summons

Complaint

04/09/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialHarco National Insurance; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-00459; Law Office of Todd F. Haines; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialHarco National Insurance; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs after Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • FinancialHarco National Insurance; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-01829; Haines, Todd F; $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • FinancialHarco National Insurance; Transaction Assessment; $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch Request Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Facts Unsatisfied Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialHarco National Insurance; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-05101; Law Office of Todd F. Haines; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Court Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialHarco National Insurance; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-08634; HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialHarco National Insurance; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant