This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/06/2020 at 01:21:31 (UTC).

Gurdial Singh vs. Kulbir Bajwa

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 Gurdial Singh filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Kulbir Bajwa. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Proietti, Donald, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0987

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Proietti, Donald

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singh, Gurdial

Defendant

Bajwa, Kulbir S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newman, William A

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

10/17/2016: Abstract of Judgment

Declaration

09/28/2016: Declaration

Notice

09/28/2016: Notice

Declaration

09/07/2016: Declaration

Notice

09/07/2016: Notice

Document Return Form

08/08/2016: Document Return Form

Declaration

08/04/2016: Declaration

Proof of Service

05/16/2016: Proof of Service

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

05/12/2016: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Judgment by Court

05/12/2016: Judgment by Court

Trial Exhibit List

05/09/2016: Trial Exhibit List

Unlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

05/09/2016: Unlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

Answer

05/06/2016: Answer

Proof of Service

04/22/2016: Proof of Service

Deposition

04/22/2016: Deposition

Notice of Court Trial

04/21/2016: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Court Trial

04/21/2016: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Court Trial

04/21/2016: Notice of Court Trial

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • FinancialSingh, Gurdial; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-05507; Law Office of Darryl E. Young; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • FinancialSingh, Gurdial; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketHearing: Other; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Singh, Gurdial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketLODGED: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • FinancialSingh, Gurdial; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-12034; Singh, Gurdial; $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • FinancialSingh, Gurdial; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketLODGED: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • FinancialSingh, Gurdial; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-04045; Singh, Gurdial; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • FinancialSingh, Gurdial; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newman, William A