This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 11:06:33 (UTC).

Guillermina Fuentes vs Castle Family Health Centers, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 Guillermina Fuentes filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Castle Family Health Centers, Inc. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2080

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fuentes, Guillermina

Defendant

Castle Family Health Centers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aiwazian, Edwin

Defendant Attorney

Crass, Steven M

 

Court Documents

60008Complain00664a8

07/06/2022: 60008Complain00664a8

60008SummonsS01de8cd

07/06/2022: 60008SummonsS01de8cd

60008CivilCas0217dea

07/06/2022: 60008CivilCas0217dea

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

07/18/2022: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Proof of Service Summons

08/17/2022: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service

08/18/2022: Proof of Service

Answer

09/13/2022: Answer

Motion

12/13/2022: Motion

Memorandum:Points and Authorities

12/13/2022: Memorandum:Points and Authorities

Declaration

12/13/2022: Declaration

Declaration

12/13/2022: Declaration

Proof of Service

01/06/2023: Proof of Service

Stipulation and Order

01/17/2023: Stipulation and Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFuentes, Guillermina; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2023-01265; Fuentes, Guillermina; $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFuentes, Guillermina; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialCastle Family Health Centers, Inc.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-32918; Castle Family Health Centers, Inc.; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialCastle Family Health Centers, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialCastle Family Health Centers, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • FinancialFuentes, Guillermina; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-17827; Fuentes, Guillermina; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • FinancialFuentes, Guillermina; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven M. Crass