This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 15:17:58 (UTC).

Grace Araujo, et al vs. Alicia Hodreeker, et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2015 Grace Araujo filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Alicia Hodreeker. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0091

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Araujo, Grace

Defendant

Hodreeker, Alicia

 

Court Documents

Summons - Filed

01/12/2015: Summons - Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/12/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

01/12/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Complaint

01/12/2015: Complaint

Proof of Service Summons

01/13/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

01/21/2015: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

01/21/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

01/22/2015: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

01/23/2015: Request Dismissal

Document Return Form

01/23/2015: Document Return Form

Request Entry of Default

01/26/2015: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

01/27/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

01/27/2015: Request Entry of Default

Judgment Default by Clerk

01/28/2015: Judgment Default by Clerk

Writ of Possession

01/28/2015: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

02/05/2015: Writ of Possession

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Araujo, Grace; Hodreeker, Alicia; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • FinancialAraujo, Grace; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-00773; Araujo, Grace; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • FinancialAraujo, Grace; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • FinancialAraujo, Grace; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-00262; Araujo, Grace; $243.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • FinancialAraujo, Grace; Transaction Assessment; $243.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Araujo, Grace; Served: 01/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less