Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/06/2020 at 18:30:30 (UTC).

Global Capital Fund 5, LLC vs. Jeff Martinez

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 Global Capital Fund 5, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jeff Martinez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark and Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1909

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Global Capital Fund 5, LLC

Defendant

Martinez, Jeff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

Judgment by Court

08/05/2016: Judgment by Court

Declaration

08/05/2016: Declaration

Request Court Judgment

08/05/2016: Request Court Judgment

Writ of Possession

07/26/2016: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

07/15/2016: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Clerk

07/15/2016: Judgment Default by Clerk

Proof of Service Summons

07/15/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

07/15/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

07/15/2016: Request Entry of Default

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

06/30/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Complaint

06/30/2016: Complaint

Summons

06/30/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/30/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Global Capital Fund 5, LLC; Martinez, Jeff; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FinancialGlobal Capital Fund 5, LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-03617; Bruce Doerksen; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FinancialGlobal Capital Fund 5, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • FinancialGlobal Capital Fund 5, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-08546; Global Capital Fund 5, LLC; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • FinancialGlobal Capital Fund 5, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowe, Anthony Drew