Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 16:08:43 (UTC).

Fireside Bank vs Luisa Gonzalez et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2010 Fireside Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Luisa Gonzalez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4658

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fireside Bank

Fireside Thrift Co

Defendants

Gonzalez, Luisa

Lorenana, Juan

Ambriz, Luisa

Tonzalez, Luisa

Lorenzana, Juan G

Gonsalez, Luisa

Luzo, Juan L

Lorenzano, Juan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luna, Sharon T

 

Court Documents

Notice of Renewal of Judgment

02/05/2020: Notice of Renewal of Judgment

Memorandum

02/05/2020: Memorandum

Renewal of judgment

02/05/2020: Renewal of judgment

Memorandum

12/26/2018: Memorandum

Writ of Execution

12/26/2018: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

12/26/2018: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

12/26/2018: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

12/26/2018: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

09/13/2017: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

01/24/2017: Writ of Execution

Memorandum

01/05/2017: Memorandum

Document Return Form

11/29/2016: Document Return Form

Memorandum

11/08/2016: Memorandum

Document Return Form

10/24/2016: Document Return Form

Public Historical Documents

10/24/2016: Public Historical Documents

Memorandum

10/18/2016: Memorandum

Judgment

12/01/2010: Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Fireside Bank; Awarded Against; Gonzalez, Luisa; Lorenana, Juan; Amount; Damages: $7,606.02; Pre-Judgment Interest: $6,833.45; Costs: $45.00; Total: $14484.47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRenewal of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • FinancialFireside Bank; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-00018; Fireside Bank; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • FinancialFireside Bank; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • FinancialFireside Bank; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-00431; Winn Law Group, APC; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2010
  • DocketApplication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • FinancialFireside Bank; Counter Payment; Receipt # 89617; Coleman & Horowitt; $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • FinancialFireside Bank; Transaction Assessment; $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketSummons - Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fireside Thrift Co is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRESIDE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHARON T LUNA