This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/08/2021 at 18:01:05 (UTC).

Fernanda Saude, et al vs Maria Delgado, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Fernanda Saude filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Maria Delgado. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0062

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saude, Fernanda

Defendants

Delgado, Maria

Delgado, Tony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/07/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/07/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

01/07/2021: Summons

Declaration

01/07/2021: Declaration

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

02/16/2021: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Application & Order

02/18/2021: Application & Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication & Order; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • FinancialSaude, Fernanda; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2021-04655; Saude, Fernanda; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • FinancialSaude, Fernanda; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialSaude, Fernanda; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2021-01272; Saude, Fernanda; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialSaude, Fernanda; Transaction Assessment; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUD Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph